+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
- Transmitted version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 9, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: NRRA - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to NRRA - Stevens
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Stevens Floor amendment, reference to the Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
HCR 2034VMA
Senate Fact Sheet
Stevens Floor amendment, reference to the Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
HCR2030_caucus floor
Senate Fact Sheet
HCR2030nripd
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
July 1, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
June 12, 2009: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 9, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2009: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor