+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Nrra
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Con Res - Peshlakai
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Peshlakai Floor Amendment; Reference to printed resolution
House Adopted Amendment
Peshlakai Floor Amendment; Reference to printed resolution
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 13, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 7
February 11, 2014: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 11, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor