+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Failed
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:43PM.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Federalism and States' Rights Committee: do pass.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism and States' Rights Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 42
February 18, 2016: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 42
- Present/NV: 3
January 19, 2016: Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
January 19, 2016: House Federalism and States' Rights Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
January 19, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 19, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2