+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: withdrawn.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
February 22, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 1
February 22, 2016: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9