+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to Secretary of State.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- First read in Senate.
- Third read in Senate: UA
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: UA
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Health Committee: withdrawn.
- House Rules Committee: withdrawn.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor