+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Jud
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Vote detail 32 25 3 0 passed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
- Representative townsend moved that the House reconsider hcr2027 on wednesday, march 12th, 2014. motion passed by v/v.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Failed
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2014: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 2
February 3, 2014: Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 3, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor