+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 10, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: RULES
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Concurrent Resolution - Pancrazi
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 10, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 2
February 5, 2009: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 5, 2009: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor