+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 8:55AM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2018: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 26, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
January 24, 2018: House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
January 24, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6