+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Government & Elections Committee: do pass.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government & Elections Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
March 8, 2021: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
March 4, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
February 1, 2021: House Government & Elections Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
February 1, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor