+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 11:12AM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (2)
February 8, 2017: House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 8, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor