+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Government & Elections Committee: do pass.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government & Elections Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (2)
February 3, 2021: House Government & Elections Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
February 3, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor