+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:55AM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Government & Elections Committee: do pass.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government & Elections Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 14
February 2, 2021: House Government & Elections Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 5
February 2, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor