+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
- Transmitted version: House engrossed version
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Miscellaneous motion
- Hcr2019 substituted for scr1031 on third reading.
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Third read: Passed
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 18, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to GOV - Deschene #1
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to GOV - Deschene #2
- Third read: Passed
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 15, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 10, 2009 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On June 9, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On June 8, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 22, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
June 18, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 10
June 8, 2009: Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
June 8, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2