+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to Secretary of State.
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:43PM.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (10)
May 7, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
May 7, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2016: Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 1, 2016: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
February 16, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 6
February 16, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 6
January 19, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 19, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 19, 2016: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 19, 2016: House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor