+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Jud
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:02 pm
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2014: Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor