+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 24, 2008 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
- Amendment passed: CMMA
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 6, 2008: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
February 6, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor