+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Finance: Do pass
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (5)
March 17, 2015: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 4
February 16, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor