+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
- Transmitted version: House engrossed version
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Transmit to Senate
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 11, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to HHS - Barto
- Amendment: HHS - passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On June 9, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 8, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- House first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Barto Floor amendment, reference to the Health and Human Services Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
HCR2014HEALTH
Senate Fact Sheet
Barto Floor amendment, reference to the Health and Human Services Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
June 22, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
June 12, 2009: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
June 11, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 7
May 21, 2009: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
May 21, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor