+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:29AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee: do pass.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (3)
February 22, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 6
January 18, 2018: House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 18, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor