+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- FPRPP - passed
- SUB Floor Amend to FPRPP to Bill - Salman - failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Failed
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee: do pass amended.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 31
January 17, 2017: House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor