+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: RHS
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Con Res - Lovas
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reform and Human Services: Do pass amended
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Reform and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Reform and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Reform and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Lovas Floor Amendment; Reference to printed resolution
House Adopted Amendment
Reform and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Lovas Floor Amendment; Reference to printed resolution
House Adopted Amendment
Reform and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 15, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2014: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
March 4, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 6
January 28, 2014: Reform and Human Services: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor