+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Federalism and States' Rights
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (3)
February 12, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 2
February 2, 2015: Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 2, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor