+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:45PM.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
February 18, 2021: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 4, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
January 11, 2021: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
January 11, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor