+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
- Transmitted version: House engrossed version
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 3:05 pm
On March 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass
On March 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Concurrent Memorial - Nichols
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 3:26 pmobject
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Water and Energy: Do pass
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Water and Energy
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Nichols Floor amendment; reference to printed memorial
House Adopted Amendment
Nichols Floor amendment; reference to printed memorial
House Adopted Amendment
3-26 nripd
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 27, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
March 22, 2010: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 6
February 9, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 9, 2010: Water and Energy: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor