+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to Secretary of State.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 11:12AM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
April 27, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
March 22, 2017: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 22, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
February 9, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 9, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor