+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
- Transmitted version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Retirement and Rural Development: Do pass
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Retirement and Rural Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
HCM2009rrd
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
July 1, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
June 18, 2009: Retirement and Rural Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
May 14, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 4
April 14, 2009: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
April 14, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (57)
Type:
Primary Sponsor