+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate first read
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 1:45 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- House first read
+ − Votes (3)
June 17, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 10
February 16, 2009: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8