+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:55 pm
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 4:13 pm
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (5)
April 4, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2013: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
March 7, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 1
February 13, 2013: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 13, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor