+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to Secretary of State.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:18PM.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee: do pass.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- MAPS - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
April 5, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
April 5, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2016: Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2016: Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 4
January 26, 2016: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 26, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 26, 2016: House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 26, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor