+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:20 pm
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ED
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
April 18, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2012: Government Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
January 17, 2012: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
January 17, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1