+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
- Final disposition: None
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 12:15 pm
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-27 GOV
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
February 21, 2007: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 19, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
January 29, 2007: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
January 29, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor