+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:21PM.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- House Federal Relations Committee: do pass.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federal Relations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (3)
February 13, 2020: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 11
January 28, 2020: House Federal Relations Committee
- Yeas: 5
January 28, 2020: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor