+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Smith flr amend (ref Mem)
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pmobject
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: MAPS
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Con Mem - Judd
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Smith flr amend (ref Mem) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judd Floor Amendment; Reference to printed concurrent memorial
House Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Proposed Amendment
Smith flr amend (ref Mem) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Proposed Amendment
Judd Floor Amendment; Reference to printed concurrent memorial
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2012: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
March 1, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
January 17, 2012: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 17, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1