+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:02 pm
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- House first waived
- House second waived
- Third read: Unanimously adopted
+ − Amendment
2-28 ge
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Vote
February 19, 2013: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor