+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- Final disposition: Failed in House on final passage
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- House final read: Failed
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On June 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 1:45 pmobject
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Public Employees, Retirement and Entitlement Reform: Do pass
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Employees, Retirement and Entitlement Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
July 1, 2009: House final read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 21
July 1, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
June 10, 2009: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 11, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 8
February 5, 2009: Public Employees, Retirement and Entitlement Reform: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 5, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor