+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pm
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (5)
March 30, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2015: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 25, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 9, 2015: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
February 9, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2