+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Water and Agriculture Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- NREW - passed
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2020: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
February 12, 2020: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
- Yeas: 11
February 12, 2020: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor