+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- MISCELLANEOUS MOTION: HCM 2003 substituted for SCM 1015. Motion carried.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (4)
March 11, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 4, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
February 9, 2015: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 9, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor