+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to Secretary of State.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- HCM 2001 substituted for SCM 1002. Motion carried.: Passed
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:10PM.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (8)
February 15, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
February 15, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
February 11, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 24
February 11, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 1
January 19, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 19, 2016: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
January 19, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 19, 2016: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2