+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 18, 2024 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On June 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On June 15, 2024 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On June 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- First read in Senate.
- HB 2908 substituted for SB 1746. Motion carried.: PASSED
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On June 15, 2024 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On June 14, 2024 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On June 13, 2024 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Second read in House.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On June 12, 2024 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
June 15, 2024: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 25
June 15, 2024: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
June 12, 2024: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 7
June 12, 2024: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor