+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 9, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing House Bill 2906 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried.: PASSED
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2906 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading: PASSED
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (2)
June 30, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
June 25, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 25
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor