+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing House Bill 2893 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried.: PASSED
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Cobb - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to COBB Floor Amend - Kavanagh - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Second read in House.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
June 30, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 11
June 24, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
May 24, 2021: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
May 24, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor