+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 28, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On June 23, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- HB 2856 substituted for SB 1723. Motion carried.: PASSED
- First read in Senate.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- Transmit to Senate.
On June 22, 2022 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On June 21, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On June 20, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (4)
June 23, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
June 22, 2022: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 7
June 20, 2022: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
June 20, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor