+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 7, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On June 24, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On June 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- Senator Gray moved to suspend Senate Rules 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing HB 2853 on the Order of Business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. See: MIS 006 13-11-6: PASSED
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Transmit to Governor.
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
- Senate Rules Committee: withdrawn.
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
- Senate Appropriations Committee: withdrawn.
On June 22, 2022 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Floor Amend to Bill - Hoffman - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Toma - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On June 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Transmit to Senate.
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On June 21, 2022 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On June 20, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- House Ways & Means Committee: do pass.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
June 24, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 10
June 22, 2022: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 26
June 22, 2022: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
June 15, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
June 15, 2022: House Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor