+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:37PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- House Regulatory Affairs Committee: do pass.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Regulatory Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2020: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 27, 2020: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
February 11, 2020: House Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 11, 2020: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8