+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 7, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 170
- Action: Signed
On May 5, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 29, 2008 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 24, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Gray C flr amend (ref JUD)
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On March 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole:
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Sinema
- Amendment passed: JUD
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Homeland Security and Property Rights: Withdrawn
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Homeland Security and Property Rights
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (13)
Gray C Floor Amendment; reference to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
SIT COW Driggs Floor amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Sinema Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gray C Floor Amendment; reference to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Sinema Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
SIT COW Driggs Floor amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
4-1 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
May 5, 2008: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Present/NV: 9
April 24, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 4
March 31, 2008: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
March 27, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
February 18, 2008: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
February 18, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2