+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Cobb - passed
- SUB Floor Amend to NREW - Griffin - passed
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee: do pass amended.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
February 9, 2022: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 5
February 9, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor