+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (3)
February 11, 2020: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
February 11, 2020: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 11, 2020: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 7