+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:55AM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (2)
February 8, 2021: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 8, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor