+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 186
- Action: Signed
On April 2, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: CE (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy: Do pass amended
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate first read
- Transmit to Senate
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Energy
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Amendment substituted: COM
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to COM - Brophy McGee
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - McCune Davis
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
+ − Amendments (14)
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
McCune Davis Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Energy
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Brophy McGee SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the COMMERCE Committee amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Energy
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Energy
Senate Adopted Amendment
McCune Davis Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Brophy McGee SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the COMMERCE Committee amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Energy
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 2, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 20
March 28, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
March 6, 2012: Commerce and Energy: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 2
February 7, 2012: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 7, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor